OR HB4163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 98, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 98, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Higher Education Coordinating Commission, instead of Oregon Department of Administrative Services, receives appropriations to pay bond-related costs of certain Article XI-G bonds. Provides that commission may enter into agreements with Oregon Health and Science University to receive debt service payments for certain bond obligations and administer certain tax compliance obligations. Validates appropriations to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission and Department of Justice in chapter 673, Oregon Laws 2017. Validates expenditures by commission and department pursuant to appropriations. Repeals and reenacts program in which commission awards supplemental grants to counties for downward departure prison diversion programs. Sunsets program on July 1, 2023. Provides that civil penalties for certain violations related to cannabis are deposited in General Fund. Deletes provision relating to addition of fees by Department of Revenue to liquidated and delinquent debts to recover costs of data match system. Requires Secretary of State to contract for periodic actuarial review of Public Employees Retirement System. Requires secretary to submit review to Public Employees Retirement Board and Joint Legislative Audit Committee. Provides that Oregon Health Authority may appoint designee to carry out certain duties related to cancer registry system. Removes requirement that Legislative Branch must contribute six percent of salary for legislator members of state deferred compensation plan. Makes permanent current law relating to establishment of legislator salaries. Increases salaries of judges of Court of Appeals, Supreme Court, circuit courts and Oregon Tax Court. Transfers Oregon Volunteers Commission for Voluntary Action and Service from Office of Governor to Higher Education Coordinating Commission. Modifies duties of volunteers commission. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 98, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018. |
2018-04-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-03 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Parrish, Smith DB. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 17--Boles, Buehler, Bynum, Esquivel, Evans, Gorsek, Helfrich, McKeown, Meek, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sollman, Sprenger, Vial; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2018-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-03-02 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |