OR HB4159 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies statewide greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals. Establishes Oregon Climate Action Program and related provisions administered by Department of Environmental Quality. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Authorizes Public Utilities Commission to allow rate or rate schedule to include differential rates or to reflect amounts for programs that enable public utilities to assist low-income residential customers. Authorizes commission to allow rate or rate schedule to reflect amounts for investments in infrastructure measures that support adoption of alternative forms of transportation vehicles. Amends greenhouse gas reporting statute. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule standards and requirements for reducing methane gas emissions from landfills. Abolishes Oregon Global Warming Commission and transfers duties to Oregon Climate Board. Provides for direct expedited review by Oregon Supreme Court of certain constitutional question related to Oregon Climate Action Program. Requires and modifies certain reports and proposals. Establishes Joint Committee on Climate Action. Establishes Oregon Climate Board. Establishes within Oregon Department of Administrative Services, Climate Policy Office and Director of Climate Policy Office to advise on development of Oregon Climate Action Plan, on implementation of plan and on investments of state proceeds from program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-17HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback