OR HB4159 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 118, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 118, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to adopt rules providing that, if Oregon Investment Council invests assets of individual account program in multiple risk categories depending on characteristics of individual member, member of individual account program may elect to have moneys in member's individual accounts deposited into approved investment option. Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to adopt rules providing that, if Oregon Investment Council invests assets of individual account program in multiple risk categories depending on characteristics of individual member, member of individual account program may direct investment of individual accounts in any risk category or with other assets of Public Employees Retirement Fund] elect to have moneys in member's individual accounts deposited into approved investment option. Directs office of State Treasurer to review legal and fiduciary standards. Provides that if office of State Treasurer determines that standards prohibit implementation of Act, board may not adopt rules to implement Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the individual account program of the Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 118, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018. |
2018-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Kruse, Thatcher, Winters. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Eng and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |