OR HB4156 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 106, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Department of Human Services to appear as party in juvenile court proceeding without appearance of Attorney General at any hearing held after hearing on jurisdictional petition required by specified statute, and any proceeding where district attorney represents state and positions of department and state are not in conflict. Authorizes Department of Human Services to appear as party in juvenile court proceeding without appearance of Attorney General at any uncontestedÙ hearing held after hearing on jurisdictional petition required by specified statute, and any hearingÙ proceeding where district attorney appears on behalf ofÙ represents state and positions of department and state are not in conflict. Directs court to order reasonable continuance of hearing that was not initially contested, but that becomes contested, to allow department time to obtain assistance of district attorney or legal representation of Attorney General.Ù Sunsets January 2, 2016Ù June 30, 2015. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to appearance by attorney in juvenile court proceedings; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 106, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2014-03-03SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-25SenateReferred to Rules.
2014-02-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hicks; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei.
2014-02-21HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-19HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Rules.
2014-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback