OR HB4154 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 78, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Insurance Exchange Corporation to request federal agency to allow individuals and businesses to qualify for premium tax credits, cost-sharing reductions and business tax relief if individuals and businesses enrolled in qualified health plans directly with insurers. Expands authority of Governor to remove members of board of directors of Oregon Health Insurance Exchange Corporation. Sunsets expanded authority on July 1, 2015. Makes employees of Cover Oregon subject to state whistleblower protections. Authorizes Oregon Health Authority, overseen by Oregon Medical Insurance Pool Board, to make expenditures for transitional medical insurance pool program from ending balance of premium assessments and reinsurance program funds.Ù Modifies requirements for Oregon Reinsurance Program to align with changes in federal law.Ù Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to administration of health insurance; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 78, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
2014-03-19HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-05SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2014-03-04SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-03-04HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Hicks, Parrish; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-03-04HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-03-03HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-17HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2014-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4154
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4154/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4154/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4154/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4154/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4154/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4154/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20049
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20252
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318783
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319099

Bill Comments

feedback