OR HB4152 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to adopt rules establishing program of state inspection for processing and sale of meat products from amenable species, including but not limited to cattle and sheep. Requires State Department of Agriculture to adopt rules governing inspection of wholly intrastate processing and sale of beef and lamb.] Authorizes department to adopt rules establishing program of state inspection for processing and sale of meat products from nonamenable species, as defined by department by rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to meat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark.
2020-02-20HouseCarried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-19HouseCarried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-18HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-10HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Agriculture and Land Use.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback