OR HB4151 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases rate of privilege tax imposed on Oregon motor vehicle dealers upon retail sale of taxable motor vehicle and rate of use tax imposed on storage, use or other consumption in this state of taxable motor vehicle purchased at retail. Applies to any taxable motor vehicle sold at retail in any jurisdiction within or outside this state that is registered by purchaser residing within county any part of which is situated within boundaries of metropolitan service district to address within district] county. Directs revenue from increase in privilege tax to be used to supplement rebates otherwise made under zero-emission and electric vehicle rebate program and Charge Ahead Oregon Program with respect to taxable motor vehicles registered by purchaser residing within county any part of which is situated within boundaries of metropolitan service district to address within county. Requires electric companies, Oregon Community Power and consumer-owned utilities to collect one percent public purpose charge from retail electricity consumers located within part of service area that is within Portland metropolitan service district. Requires investment of public purpose charge funds in programs to accelerate transportation electrification and grid modernization efforts that support transportation electrification. Authorizes certain retail electricity consumers to direct their own transportation electrification projects and receive credit against public purpose charges.] Requires electric companies to invest amount in programs to support acceleration of transportation electrification that is equal to no less than one-half of one percent of total rates collected annually from retail electricity consumers located within part of service area that is within Portland metropolitan service district. Modifies provisions relating to transportation electrification. Directs Public Utility Commission to submit annual report to Legislative Assembly on programs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to funding the transition to electric motor vehicles; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments. Refer to Revenue, then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-18 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Revenue, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |