OR HB4150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 38, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 38, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified information to be shared with student, staff member or certain person following conclusion of investigation related to sexual harassment. Requires specified information to be shared with student, or] staff member or certain person following conclusion of investigation related to sexual harassment. Directs State Board of Education to adopt requirements for school district policies on sexual harassment by staff members and students of persons who are on or immediately adjacent to school grounds, at any school-sponsored activity, on school-provided transportation or at any official school bus stop. Takes effect July 1, 2018.
Title
Relating to school sexual harassment policies; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 38, (2018 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark. |
2018-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |