OR HB4150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 42, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 42, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises assessment and grading system standards for school districts. Establishes standards for proficiency education. Requires allowance of use of accommodations for students who provide work samples to demonstrate proficiency in Essential Learning Skills. Directs Department of Education to conduct evaluation on impact of requirement to demonstrate proficiency in Essential Learning Skills on high school graduation rates. Directs Department of Education to negotiate with United States Department of Education to determine appropriate use of new statewide summative assessment and to submit report related to new statewide summative assessment to Legislative Assembly by December 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to student assessments; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 42, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, George, Whitsett. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |