OR HB4150 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 73, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 73, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Credit Enhancement Fund; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the Credit Enhancement Fund; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 73, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-27 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-24 | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Starr. | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2012-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-14 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G.. | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading. Carried by Holvey, Read. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Cowan. | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |