OR HB4149 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Director of Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission to work with Director of Oregon Health Authority and Deputy Superintendent of Public Instruction to develop intervention strategy to address substance use among school-aged children and youth, and report strategy to Legislative Assembly by November 1, 2020. Requires Director of Oregon Health Authority to work with Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission to take statewide inventory of services available to prevent and treat substance use disorders and to support individuals in recovery from substance use disorders. Specifies requirements for inventory. Requires Director of Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission to report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to mental and behavioral health by November 1, 2020. Expands designated state agencies that must work with commission and requires agencies to meet with commission quarterly to review and report on each agency's progress and to report process and outcome measures established under commission's comprehensive addiction, prevention, treatment and recovery plan. Sunsets certain provisions on January 2, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to behavioral health; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2020-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2020-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Behavioral Health.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback