OR HB4148 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Act directs an agency to expand programs related to wildlife illness. The Act directs an agency to perform a review. The Act directs an agency to establish a program for living with wildlife. The Act makes changes related to wildlife paths and roads. The Act gives moneys for related purposes. The Act goes into effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 63.3). Directs the State Department of Fish and Wildlife to expand programs related to wildlife disease. Directs the Invasive Species Council to undertake a review of council programs and activities. Directs the department to establish a wildlife coexistence program. Makes certain changes concerning a program to reduce wildlife-vehicle collisions. Appropriates moneys out of the General Fund for implementing the expansion, review, new program and changes to wildlife programs. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to natural resources; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |