OR HB4148 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Declares Oregon policy regarding Indian children. Modifies Oregon child welfare laws regarding Indian children to conform] reconcile with provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act.
Title
Relating to Indian children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez, Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Evans, Greenlick, Smith DB. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third Reading commenced. Carried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third Reading commenced. Carried over to February 19, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |