OR HB4148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-14)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 41, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-14)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 41, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes interest rate accruing on deferred taxes under homestead property tax deferral program from six percent compounded annually to six percent per annum. Applies to interest accruing on taxes advanced to counties for tax-deferred property for property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2014 retroactively with respect to amounts paid on or after July 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the rate of interest on deferred taxes under the homestead property tax deferral program; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 41, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Starr. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |