OR HB4146 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers $7 million from Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement to Health System Fund to pay for Oregon Reinsurance Program. Increases taxes on cigarettes. Imposes assessment on ambulatory surgical centers and emergency ambulance services to be used for medical assistance program. Modifies hospital assessment and requires Oregon Health Authority to take specified actions with respect to medical assistance program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4146 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4146/Introduced |