OR HB4145 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates crime of unlawfully threatening a school or place of worship. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both, or five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both, if defendant has certain prior convictions at time of offense.
Title
Relating to unlawful threats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4145 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4145/Introduced |