OR HB4144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 114, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 114, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows identified election worker to have residence address exempted from disclosure as public record by county clerk. Allows identified election worker to have residence address exempted from disclosure as public record by county clerk. Establishes that crime of harassment or aggravated harassment] includes harassment against election worker. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine], or both. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to election workers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Chapter 114, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2022. |
2022-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Carried over to 03-03 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Valderrama. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 2--George, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bonham, Boshart Davis. |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |