OR HB4143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 45, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 45, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to study barriers to effective treatment for and recovery from substance use disorders, including addictions to opioids and opiates, and to report and make recommendations to Legislative Assembly not later than June 30, 2018. Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to study barriers to medication assisted] effective treatment for and recovery from substance use disorders, including addictions to opioids and opiates, and to report and make recommendations to Legislative Assembly not later than June 30, 2018. Sunsets January 2, 2019. Directs Oregon Health Authority to implement pilot project to place peer recovery support mentors in emergency departments to support] determine effectiveness of establishing immediate access to appropriate evidence-based treatments for persons who suffer from] opioid and opiate overdoses. Requires authority to report on pilot project to interim committee of Legislative Assembly not later than December 31 of each year. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Requires practitioners to register with prescription monitoring program not later than July 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 45, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Kruse, Thatcher, Winters. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |