OR HB4142 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates minimum amount of fee added to judgment that includes monetary obligation that court or judicial branch is charged with collecting. Modifies authority of Chief Justice of the Supreme Court with regard to waiver or suspension of certain fees by courts and commissions, departments and divisions in judicial branch. Clarifies provisions relating to prohibition of compromise of restitution or compensatory fine in criminal money judgment. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to collection of court-imposed financial obligations; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lawrence Spence. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Clem, Greenlick. |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |