OR HB4141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for deposit in Court Appointed Special Advocate Fund and distribution to CASA Volunteer Programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to CASA Volunteer Programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |