OR HB4141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 65, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 65, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public university to establish advisory body to advise university president on recommendations to governing board regarding resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Requires each public university to establish advisory body to advise university president on recommendations to governing board regarding resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Requires public university to provide specified training and information to advisory body. Requires advisory body to document consideration of specified impacts of recommended resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees before making recommendation to president of university to increase resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees by more than five percent annually. Requires advisory body to provide meaningful opportunities to participate in process and deliberation of advisory body to recognized student government and other students enrolled at public university. Requires advisory body to provide written report to president of university setting forth recommendations, deliberations and observations of advisory body regarding resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Specifies contents of report. Requires governing board to receive and consider written reports from advisory body when determining tuition and mandatory enrollment fees. Provides that if Higher Education Coordinating Commission must approve request by governing board to increase total of resident tuition and mandatory enrollment fees for undergraduate resident students by more than five percent, that public university will provide commission with written reports from advisory body and any other information or materials commission determines are necessary for commission to reach determination. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to setting the costs of attending public universities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 65, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 1--Stark. |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |