OR HB4140 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Public Hearing and Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Education to develop form for public education programs to use when student has been diagnosed with concussion or other brain injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to students diagnosed with a brain injury.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Education.
2020-02-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-12HouseThird reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Owens, Smith G.
2020-02-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 12, 2020 Calendar.
2020-02-10HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-05HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Education.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback