OR HB4140 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 123, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 123, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits release of sky lantern in Oregon airspace. Makes violation subject to maximum penalty of $2,000 fine.
Title
Relating to sky lanterns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 123, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017. |
2016-04-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Hass, President Courtney; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Carried over to 02-25 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Carried over to 02-24 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Barton, Post, Vega Pederson; Excused, 3--Boone, Heard, Kennemer. |
2016-02-11 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |