OR HB4139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The Act applies to the certificate of need program in the OHA. The Act excludes new nursing homes and new hospitals providing certain types of care. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.7). Excludes new hospitals providing inpatient psychiatric services, inpatient rehabilitation services or inpatient or outpatient substance use treatment and new long term care facilities from requirement to obtain a certificate of need from the Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to certificates of need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-03-04 | House | Motion to withdraw from Behavioral Health and Health Care failed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 31--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nguyen D, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer. |
2024-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |