OR HB4139 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows sick leave to be counted as fringe benefit for purpose of prevailing wage. Defines employer location as location of headquarters. Limits requirements for substantial equivalency. Excludes joint employers from joint and several liability. Broadens multiemployer exception to include employers offering any benefit from joint multiemployer-employee trust or benefit plan. Delays enforcement, civil and administrative actions until January 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sick leave; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/HB4139 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4139/Introduced |