OR HB4137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 44, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 44, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than December 31, 2018, its recommendations for scope and framework for its comprehensive addiction, prevention, treatment and recovery plan. Requires Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15] December 31, 2018, its recommendations for scope and framework for its comprehensive addiction, prevention, treatment and recovery plan. Requires plan to be reviewed and updated by September 15] July 1 of each even-numbered year beginning July 1, 2020. Requires Oregon Health Authority to report to Legislative Assembly on scope of alcohol and drug abuse and addiction in Oregon and on availability of prevention, treatment and recovery services.] Grants specified powers to Director of Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission to carry out duties, functions and powers of commission. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to addiction recovery; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 44, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2018-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |