OR HB4135 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 48, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 48, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Chief Information Officer to develop standards, protocols and procedures for specified executive department agencies to use in fulfilling public records requests that seek records in electronic form. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to coordinate efforts of certain executive department agencies in fulfilling public records requests for records in electronic form and to provide technical assistance to other specified executive department agencies in fulfilling public records requests for records in electronic form. Provides that duties of department become operative January 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to fulfilling public records requests for electronic records; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Chapter 48, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016. |
2016-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Komp. |
2016-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Reading. Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried. Referred. |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 11, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |