OR HB4134 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 101, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 101, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires lobbyists to file registration statement within three business days of commencing or ceasing representation of client . Requires lobbyists to update client list within five] file registration statement within three business days of commencing or ceasing representation of client during regular or special sessions of Legislative Assembly]. Requires Oregon Government Ethics Commission to make lobbyist registration and lobbyist registration updates publicly available on Internet within two business days] one calendar day of receiving information. Requires each person employing lobbyist or in whose interest lobbyist appears or works to sign designation of official authorization to lobby not later than 10 calendar days after lobbyist files statement. Permits lobbyist to unilaterally withdraw filed registration statement not more than one time per calendar year per client if certain conditions met. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to lobbyist reporting; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 101, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Weidner; Excused, 1--Barton. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-12 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |