OR HB4133 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 101, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Legislative Counsel and Department of Justice to review statute laws and identify those that are outdated, obsolete or duplicative. Authorizes Legislative Counsel, in consultation with Department of Justice, to prepare measures for odd-numbered year regular session to repeal or amend statutes so identified. Requires report explaining reason for statutory modification to accompany each measure and toÙ be published at least 90 days before start of legislative session at which measure is to be considered and be entered in legislative record. Limits amendment of measures to content related to reason statutes are being repealed or amended.Ù Sunsets on January 2, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a process for the revision of statutes due to obsolescence; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 101, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Cameron, Freeman, Sprenger, Thatcher, Unger; Excused, 3--Berger, Boone, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Jenson, Read, Williamson.
2014-03-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2014-03-03SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-17SenateReferred to Rules.
2014-02-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 26--Bentz, Berger, Buckley, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gelser, Gilliam, Gorsek, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Unger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
2014-02-12HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-10HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Rules.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4133
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/19937
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=316519
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20241
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318896
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319028

Bill Comments

feedback