OR HB4131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to establish, in collaboration with Department of Corrections, Family Preservation Project pilot program at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Provides that program shall be administered by YWCA of Greater Portland. Specifies goals of program and services that may be provided. Requires commission to perform analysis of program and report results of analysis to Legislative Assembly beginning September 15, 2022, and every two years thereafter. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission for distribution to YWCA of Greater Portland for purposes of program. Sunsets program on January 1, 2027. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Family Preservation Project; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback