OR HB4131 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 13, (2014 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 13, (2014 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows person that uses natural gas or propane in motor vehicle to pay annual special use fuel license fee in lieu of per-gallon tax. Takes effect on later of 91st day following adjournment sine die or January July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to taxation of use fuels; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Bruce Starr [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] |
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 13, (2014 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015. |
2014-03-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Beyer, Olsen, Winters. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-11 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Freeman. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |