OR HB4131 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 101, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to ratio of state agency public employees to supervisory employees; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ratio of state agency public employees to supervisory employees; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 Chapter 101, (2012 Laws): Effective date April 11, 2012.
2012-04-11 Governor signed.
2012-03-06 President signed.
2012-03-06 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-03-02 Third reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Bates, Boquist, Starr.
2012-03-01 Rules suspended. Second reading.
2012-03-01 Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2012-03-01 Referred to Ways and Means.
2012-03-01 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2012-02-29 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Cowan, Freeman, Hicks; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Richardson.
2012-02-29 Rules suspended. Second reading.
2012-02-29 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2012-02-29 Work Session held.
2012-02-28 Returned to Full Committee.
2012-02-28 Work Session held.
2012-02-27 Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2012-02-17 Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2012-02-09 Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2012-02-09 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2012-02-08 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2012-02-01 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-01 Referred to General Government and Consumer Protection with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2012-02-01 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback