OR HB4130 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public bodies to provide standardized acknowledgment of receipt of requests for public records within five business days of receipt of request. Requires state agency public records policies, and public record retention schedules of state agencies and political subdivisions of this state, to require retention of public records for a minimum of two years.] Requires public bodies to provide records, or to assert exemption from required disclosure, within 30 days of receipt of request. Provides exceptions where five-day and 30-day time periods do not apply. Permits public body to exceed 30-day deadline if public body provides requester with estimated time that records will be disclosed or exemptions claimed. Permits requesters to petition for administrative or judicial review if public body fails to meet 30-day deadline. Limits amounts public bodies with 10 or more full-time equivalent employees may charge as fees for producing public records.] Directs county clerks and city elections officers to give notice to Secretary of State regarding petitions for county or local initiative measures, and requires secretary to provide reasonable statewide notice of county or local initiative measures. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Secretary of State to implement statewide notice of county or local initiative measures. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to transparency in governmental decision-making.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Rep. John Lively [D] |
Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-15 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |