OR HB4129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 37, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 37, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Act requires OHA and DHS to contract with no more than two agencies to provide agency with choice services. The Act defines the services that must be provided and the rights of individuals who receive the services. The Act requires the OHA and DHS to adopt certain rules. The Act requires people who provide agency with choice services to report any suspected child abuse or neglect to the proper powers that be. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.9). Requires the Department of Human Services and the Oregon Health Authority to contract with no more than two agencies to provide agency with choice services to individuals who are older adults or who have disabilities. Specifies the duties of the agency providing agency with choice services and rights of the individuals who are receiving agency with choice services. Requires the department and the authority to adopt rules that contain specified provisions. Specifies that all agency with choice providers are mandatory reporters of abuse or neglect.
Title
Relating to in-home service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 37, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025. |
2024-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Patterson declared potential conflict of interest. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Weber. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bowman. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 22--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright, Yunker; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Cramer, Neron. |
2024-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2024-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |