OR HB4129 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires veterinarians to register with prescription monitoring program established by Oregon Health Authority. Requires pharmacies that dispense prescription drugs prescribed by veterinarians to report dispensation to prescription monitoring program. Allows Oregon State Veterinary Medical Examining Board to adopt rules in consultation with authority. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescription drugs prescribed by veterinarians; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback