OR HB4127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits contracting agency, in conducting procurement for architectural, engineering, photogrammetric mapping, transportation planning and land surveying services, to consider pricing policies, proposals and other pricing information along with prospective consultant's qualifications in specified circumstances. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a consultant selection process for a public contract for certain services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barreto, Boles, Esquivel, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Nathanson, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Whisnant, Williamson, Wilson, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Stark. |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |