OR HB4127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 46, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 46, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes statutory changes to achieve gender neutral language with respect to individuals who are in marital relationship. Establishes state policy that same privileges, immunities, rights, benefits and responsibilities granted or imposed by law apply on equivalent terms to married individuals of different sex or same sex. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to gender neutrality in laws; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Chapter 46, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016. |
2016-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Carried over to 02-25 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Carried over to 02-24 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 13--Barreto, Gilliam, Hack, Heard, Huffman, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 4--Buckley, Buehler, Krieger, Olson. |
2016-02-04 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |