OR HB4127 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that majority of members of Oregon Education Investment Board be public educational professionals who work, or have worked, on regular basis in public educational setting. Requires that four or more members of board represent interests of work, or have worked, on regular basis in public education from kindergarten through grade 12. Applies to board membership on or after January 1, 2015. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the membership of the Oregon Education Investment Board; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kotek. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |