OR HB4127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certification of mental health providers; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to certification of mental health providers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Beyer [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] | Rep. Michael Schaufler [D] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-08 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |