OR HB4126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes product stewardship program for household hazardous waste. Establishes Household Hazardous Waste Stewardship Fund. Becomes operative January 1, 2019. Requires initial plans for household hazardous waste stewardship programs to be submitted to Department of Environmental Quality no later than April 1, 2020. Requires household hazardous waste stewardship program pursuant to approved plan to be implemented no earlier than January 1, 2021. Imposes penalty for violation of program provisions not to exceed $25,000 per day for each day of violation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to household hazardous waste; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-14HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback