OR HB4126 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 100, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows consumer-owned utilities to use certain amount of unbundled renewable energy certificates to meet renewable portfolio standard under certain circumstances. Directs Public Utility Commission to conduct study on allowing electric companies to offer voluntary renewable energy tariffs to nonresidential customers. Specifies factors for commission to consider, including impact that such tariffs would have on other customers. Authorizes such tariffs upon commission determination to allow such tariffs. Specifies that all costs associated with tariff are borne by nonresidential customer receiving services under tariff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 100, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-04SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-02-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2014-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-13SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2014-02-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 60.
2014-02-10HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-06HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback