OR HB4124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 71, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 71, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Education to conduct survey related to academic assessments administered to students by school districts and to develop recommendations and best practices related to assessments. Requires Department of Education to conduct survey related to academic assessments administered to students by school districts and to develop recommendations and best practices related to assessments. Directs department to report results of survey and recommendations and best practices to State Board of Education and to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than May 1, 2024. Requires department and board to review standards related to disclosure and transfer of information in student education records. Directs department to report results of review to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education no later than September 15, 2023.
Title
Relating to the collection of student data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 71, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Carried over to 03-03 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson, Weber. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 10--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Hayden, Morgan, Reschke, Scharf, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |