OR HB4124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Political Campaign Contribution Limits. Directs task force to study and make recommendations on how to best establish political campaign contribution limits in Oregon. Sunsets task force on July 2, 2021. Delays operative date for Ballot Measure 47 (2006) to later of date on which Oregon Supreme Court issues decision that renders Ballot Measure 47 operative or July 1, 2021. Repeals operative date provision if Oregon Supreme Court does not issue a decision that renders Ballot Measure 47 operative on or before July 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to campaign finance; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback