OR HB4124 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 99, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 99, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Youth Suicide Intervention and Prevention Coordinator within Oregon Health Authority . Establishes Youth Suicide Intervention and Prevention Coordinator within that part ofĂ™ Oregon Health Authority that works with mental health and addiction issuesĂ™. Sets forth responsibilities of coordinator. Requires update of Youth Suicide Intervention and Prevention Plan once every five years. Directs coordinator to report to Legislative Assembly regarding first plan update by January 1, 2015. Reestablishes Youth Suicide Intervention and Prevention Coordinator within that part of Oregon Health Authority that works with mental health and addiction issues. Becomes operative August 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to youth suicide; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 99, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. |
2014-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-07 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |