OR HB4123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits duplicate health benefit plan coverage for public employees who begin employment before January 1, 2020. Prohibits duplicate health benefit plan coverage for public employees who begin employment on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to coverage of family members under state-sponsored health benefit plans; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4123 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4123/Introduced |