OR HB4122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedure for charging aggravated version of certain assault and attempted murder offenses when defendant causes permanent physical injury to victim during commission of crime. Provides that if defendant is convicted of aggravated offense, court shall sentence defendant to 300 months' imprisonment. Authorizes court to impose lesser sentence in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to permanent physical injury.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Sen. Denyc Boles [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4122 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/Introduced |