OR HB4122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain police officers commissioned by Oregon Health and Science University to elect to discontinue participation in alternative retirement program and elect to participate in Public Employees Retirement System for purposes of service performed as police officer commissioned by Oregon Health and Science University on and after date of election.
Title
Relating to the status in the Public Employees Retirement System of police officers commissioned by universities.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] |
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |