OR HB4122 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires labeling of genetically engineered fish sold or offered for sale for human consumption. Allows local government to inhibit or prevent production or use of seed or seed products for purpose of protecting seed or products that are not genetically engineered from adverse impacts of genetically engineered seed or products.] Requires labeling of packaged products containing genetically engineered fish and sold or offered for sale for human consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to genetically engineered goods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2016-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2016-02-18SenateReferred to Health Care.
2016-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2016-02-17HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Mckeown.
2016-02-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 27--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 1--Barton.
2016-02-16HouseSecond reading.
2016-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2016-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2016-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2016-02-01HouseReferred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
2016-02-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2016-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback