OR HB4122 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 77, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires state contracting agency or public corporation that implements information technology initiative to obtain quality management services from qualified contractor if value of information technology initiative exceeds $5 million or meets criteria or standards that State Chief Information Officer or Director of Oregon Department of Administrative Services specifies by rule or policy. Requires state contracting agency or public corporation that implements information technology initiative to obtain , in separate procurement,Ă™ quality management services from qualified contractor if value of information technology initiative exceeds $5 million or meets certain otherĂ™ criteria or standards that State Chief Information Officer or Director of Oregon Department of Administrative Services specifies by rule or policy. Provides that state contracting agency or public corporation may not artificially divide or fragment information technology initiative to avoid requirement to procure quality management services. Requires state contracting agency and public corporation to consult with Director of Oregon Department of Administrative Services and to follow policies and procedures of Oregon Department of Administrative Services to determine extent of quality management services that state contracting agency or public corporation needs for information technology initiative. Requires quality management services contractor to provide reports to contract administrator and to State Chief Information Officer, Director of Oregon Department of Administrative Services and, as appropriate, to director of state contracting agency or governing body of public corporation. Exempts Secretary of State and State Treasurer from requirement to obtain quality management services, to consult with director or State Chief Information Officer and to provide reports. Provides exemption from requirement that state contracting agency may not accept bid or proposal from contractor that assisted state contracting agency in developing specifications or solicitation documents for bid or proposal for certain quality management services. Requires bidder or proposer to submit signed affidavit to demonstrate to contracting agency that bidder or proposer has complied with tax laws of this state or political subdivision of this state. Becomes operative July 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to standards of performance in public contracting; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 77, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 19, 2014.
2014-03-19HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 41; Nays, 16--Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 3--Berger, Conger, Weidner.
2014-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, George, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett.
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2014-02-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-19SenateReferred to Rules.
2014-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bentz, Berger, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Hanna, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hicks, Tomei.
2014-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4122
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4122/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20083
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=316930
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20223
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318756
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318882

Bill Comments

feedback