OR HB4122 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to pharmacy benefit managers; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to pharmacy benefit managers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Rep. Jean Cowan [D] | Rep. Tim Freeman [R] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] |
Rep. Jules Kopel-Bailey [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Jim Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.state.or.us/MeasureInfo/Measure/AtGlance?session=36&MeasureNumber=HB4122 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/12reg/measures/hb4100.dir/hb4122.intro.html |